This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/06/2021 at 14:43:40 (UTC).

FLOOR DEPOT, INC vs. ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 FLOOR DEPOT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0611

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLOOR DEPOT, INC

Defendants

ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC

ASSIGN REALTY LLC

SLAGLE, MICHAEL

DICKENS, RICHARD HAMILTON

BLACKSTAR GROUP

ADKINS, JOHN EUGENE

DICKENS, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLIGAN, JEREMIAH SEAN

Defendant Attorneys

CALHOUN, AUSTIN BRIAN

COLLINS, J RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

11/18/2020

43: 11/18/2020

7/21/2020

34: 7/21/2020

7/21/2020

33: 7/21/2020

9/29/2020

38: 9/29/2020

9/30/2020

39: 9/30/2020

EDWIN MICHAEL SLAGLE'S AND ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES IN COUNTS I AND II

7/1/2020: EDWIN MICHAEL SLAGLE'S AND ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES IN COUNTS I AND II

ASSIGN REALTY LLC'S AND JOHN E. ADKINS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF COUNT I OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/1/2020: ASSIGN REALTY LLC'S AND JOHN E. ADKINS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF COUNT I OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR DICKENS, RICHARD HAMILTON

6/2/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR DICKENS, RICHARD HAMILTON

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR ASSIGN REALTY LLC

6/2/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR ASSIGN REALTY LLC

12/8/2020

47: 12/8/2020

6/23/2020

25: 6/23/2020

6/2/2020

20: 6/2/2020

10/1/2020

40: 10/1/2020

6/19/2020

23: 6/19/2020

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR ADKINS, JOHN EUGENE

6/2/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR ADKINS, JOHN EUGENE

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR SLAGLE, MICHAEL

6/2/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR SLAGLE, MICHAEL

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC

6/2/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC

COMPLAINT

6/1/2020: COMPLAINT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: EDWIN MICHAEL SLAGLE AND ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MULLIGAN, JEREMIAH SEAN; COLLINS, J RUSSELL; CALHOUN, AUSTIN BRIAN REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0611, FLOOR DEPOT, INC VS. ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER ON EDWIN MICHAEL SLAGLE AND ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I, II, AND IV OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISSAL OF COUNT IV, TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFF TO POST FDUTPA BOND-1/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON EDWIN MICHAEL SLAGLE AND ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I, II, AND IV OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISSAL OF COUNT IV, TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFF TO POST FDUTPA BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS, ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC AND MICHAEL SLAGLES' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC'S AND EDWIN MICHAEL SLAGLE'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - DECEMBER 8, 2020 AT 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR BLACKSTAR GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR ASSIGN REALTY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR ASSIGN COMMERCIAL GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MULLIGAN, JEREMIAH SEAN ASSIGNED TO FLOOR DEPOT, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/02/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEntry: CORRESPONDENCE TO THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mulligan, Jeremiah Sean