This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/28/2021 at 06:58:45 (UTC).

FISCHER, STEVEN EDWARD vs. FISCHER, JEANNE J

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 FISCHER, STEVEN EDWARD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FISCHER, JEANNE J. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ALEXANDER, JOHN and MENSH, DENISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1575

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ALEXANDER, JOHN

MENSH, DENISE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FISCHER, STEVEN EDWARD

Respondent

FISCHER, JEANNE J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - Recorded (OR.5127.1982 / 2020115437)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: PARTIES OF RECORD ORDER APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: MENSH, DENISE; Location: Courtroom 228; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: REPORT FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: **STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER AND ORDER UPON FILING PROVIDED TO PETITIONER AT THE TIME OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE ALEXANDER'S STANDING ORDER DTD 01/08/20 RE: ALL FAMILY CASES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: PERMISSION TO USE EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $408.00 RECEIPT #2020028525

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE ALEXANDER, JOHN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: DISS - PROSE W/O CHILDREN ASSESSED $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/27/2020 CASE NUMBER DR20-1575

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less