Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 22:07:43 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA vs. MITCHELL, DIANE C

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MITCHELL, DIANE C. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0709

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA

Defendant

MITCHELL, DIANE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMBLEE, BRANDY

 

Court Documents

ORDER

9/11/2018: ORDER

CIVIL COURT NOTES

9/11/2018: CIVIL COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

6/1/2018: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/23/2017 FOR DIANE C. MITCHELL

6/23/2017: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/23/2017 FOR DIANE C. MITCHELL

COMPLAINT

6/23/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.4650.1017 / 2018087088)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: CHAMBLEE, BRANDY; MITCHELL, DIANE C REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-0709, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA VS. MITCHELL, DIANE C WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: FINAL JDUGEMNT-12/6/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DIANE C. MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONTRACT AND INDEBTNESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/23/2017 FOR DIANE C. MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUANCE FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: CHAMBLEE, BRANDY ASSIGNED TO FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/23/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-0709

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First National Bank of Omaha is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chamblee, Brandy L