This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/06/2021 at 09:37:52 (UTC).

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY vs. A TO Z CUSTOM HOMES INC

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A TO Z CUSTOM HOMES INC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0576

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

A TO Z CUSTOM HOMES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLANTON, CURTIS HUGH JR

Defendant Attorney

HULSEY, MARK IV

 

Court Documents

5/22/2020

9: 5/22/2020

6/17/2020

10: 6/17/2020

10/15/2020

13: 10/15/2020

10/15/2020

14: 10/15/2020

10/21/2020

19: 10/21/2020

11/6/2020

21: 11/6/2020

12/4/2020

31: 12/4/2020

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

12/4/2020: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT

12/4/2020: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/4/2020: ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.5073.1156 / 2020091978)

10/16/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.5073.1156 / 2020091978)

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

10/16/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED

8/28/2020: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

8/27/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

5/22/2020: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/21/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/21/2020 FOR A TO Z CUSTOM HOMES INC

5/21/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/21/2020 FOR A TO Z CUSTOM HOMES INC

COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (CIVIL); Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.5122.250 / 2020112991)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.5115.1322 / 2020110257)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BLANTON, CURTIS HUGH JR; HULSEY, MARK IV REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0576, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY VS. A TO Z CUSTOM HOMES INC WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT - 12/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE REOPENED FOR RO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 06/15/2020 FOR A TO Z CUSTOM HOMES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020013992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/21/2020 FOR A TO Z CUSTOM HOMES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BLANTON, CURTIS HUGH JR ASSIGNED TO EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/21/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0576

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Evanston Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blanton, Curtis Hugh Jr