Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 19:14:30 (UTC).

DRAGO, MARTIN vs. AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 DRAGO, MARTIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1645

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DRAGO, MARTIN

DRAGO, CYNTHIA

Defendant

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTSON, PETER A

Defendant Attorney

GLASGOW, GINA S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/8/2019: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO: T. DAVIS REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA19-1645, DRAGO, MARTIN VS. AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT-12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: GLASGOW, GINA S ASSIGNED TO AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 11/14/2019 - AUTO CLUB INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019038144

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/12/2019 FOR AUTO CLUB INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: ROBERTSON, PETER A ASSIGNED TO DRAGO, CYNTHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: ROBERTSON, PETER A ASSIGNED TO DRAGO, MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketJUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/08/2019 CASE NUMBER CA19-1645

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASGOW GINA S