This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/03/2023 at 14:45:47 (UTC).

DECKERHOFF, CHARLES JOE JR vs. DECKERHOFF, MELISSA A

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 DECKERHOFF, CHARLES JOE JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DECKERHOFF, MELISSA A. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2103

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DECKERHOFF, CHARLES JOE JR

Respondent

DECKERHOFF, MELISSA A

Not Yet Classified

BEARDSLEY, BRANDON D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GENNUSA, ANNE MARIE

Respondent Attorney

QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR; Location: Courtroom 355

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR; Location: Courtroom 355; Result: RESET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR; Location: Courtroom 355; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: GENNUSA, ANNE MARIE; QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA REGARDING SERVICE OF ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY) SET FOR 05/10/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 355/ , JDG: MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAILED TO DIVISION 57 JA: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEntry: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: GENNUSA, ANNE MARIE ASSIGNED TO DECKERHOFF, CHARLES JOE JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE ANTHONY, JOAN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FOR ISSUANCE BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: CORRESPONDENCE FROM GENNUSA LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/29/2022 CASE NUMBER DR22-2103

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less