This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 10/13/2020 at 17:05:55 (UTC).

COPELAND, SHANIQWA vs. VISTA HOTEL II INC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 COPELAND, SHANIQWA filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against VISTA HOTEL II INC. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0996

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COPELAND, SHANIQWA

Defendant

VISTA HOTEL II INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STORCH, NOAH E

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/14/2020: COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/15/2020 FOR VISTA HOTEL II INC

9/15/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/15/2020 FOR VISTA HOTEL II INC

 

Docket Entries

09/16/2020

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020024471

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/15/2020 FOR VISTA HOTEL II INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: STORCH, NOAH E ASSIGNED TO COPELAND, SHANIQWA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/15/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0996

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less