Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 18:05:29 (UTC).

COLCORD, DEBRA vs. BOLES, JOSEPH L JR

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 COLCORD, DEBRA filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against BOLES, JOSEPH L JR. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0133

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLCORD, DEBRA

Defendants

PATCHELL, DIANE

BOLES, JOSEPH L JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERTEL, RONALD ALLAN JR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE

3/30/2021: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE

JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

3/30/2021: JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND AMENDED NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

3/23/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND AMENDED NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

2/18/2021: JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS RETURNED -PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/10/2021 DIANE PATCHELL SUBSTITUTE TO JOHN PATCHELL

2/17/2021: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS RETURNED -PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/10/2021 DIANE PATCHELL SUBSTITUTE TO JOHN PATCHELL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS RETURNED - PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/11/2021 JOSEPH L. BOLES

2/17/2021: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS RETURNED - PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/11/2021 JOSEPH L. BOLES

SUMMONS RETURNED - PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/11/2021 JOSEPH L. BOLES INDIVIDUAL SERVICE

2/12/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED - PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/11/2021 JOSEPH L. BOLES INDIVIDUAL SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED -PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/10/2021 DIANE PATCHELL SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

2/12/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED -PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/10/2021 DIANE PATCHELL SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021003663

2/2/2021: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021003663

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES FOR DIVISION 55

2/1/2021: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES FOR DIVISION 55

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2021 FOR BOLES, JOSEPH L JR

2/1/2021: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2021 FOR BOLES, JOSEPH L JR

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2021 FOR PATCHELL, DIANE

2/1/2021: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2021 FOR PATCHELL, DIANE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/29/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/29/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/29/2021: COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND AMENDED NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS RETURNED -PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/10/2021 DIANE PATCHELL SUBSTITUTE TO JOHN PATCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS RETURNED - PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/11/2021 JOSEPH L. BOLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED - PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/11/2021 JOSEPH L. BOLES INDIVIDUAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED -PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 02/10/2021 DIANE PATCHELL SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021003663

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES FOR DIVISION 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2021 FOR BOLES, JOSEPH L JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2021 FOR PATCHELL, DIANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HERTEL, RONALD ALLAN JR ASSIGNED TO COLCORD, DEBRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/01/2021 CASE NUMBER CA21-0133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less