This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 12/13/2021 at 18:27:02 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC vs. BOISCLAIR, JONATHAN

Case Summary

On 01/28/2010 CITIMORTGAGE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOISCLAIR, JONATHAN. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0295

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIMORTGAGE INC

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

BOISCLAIR, JONATHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/16/2010

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL / OR 3345 PG 291

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2010

DocketEntry: DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2010

DocketEntry: ORDER AMENDING STYLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2010

DocketEntry: MOTION TO AMEND STYLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2010

DocketEntry: SUMS RTD SVD JONATHAN BOISCLAIR 02-16-10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2010

DocketEntry: FILING FEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $10.00 BY: CITIMORTGAGE INC, ON 01/28/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $400.00 BY: CITIMORTGAGE INC, ON 01/28/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2010

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2010

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less