This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 12/16/2021 at 00:05:42 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER OT ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP INC vs. BRETHOUR, JEROME F

Case Summary

On 07/02/2010 CITIMORTGAGE INC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER OT ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRETHOUR, JEROME F. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1866

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIMORTGAGE INC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER OT ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP INC

Defendants

TAYLOR, SELMA

BRETHOUR, KACI

BRETHOUR, DIAN M

SAINT JOHNS SIX MILE CREEK NORTH PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION I

BRETHOUR, JEROME F

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/07/2012

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE/ OR 3598 PG 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2012

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: CLERKS OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

DocketEntry: FORECLOSURE BID SHEET- PLAINTIFF $100

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2012026424

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

DocketEntry: FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2012

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2012

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,967.50 RECEIPT #2012022843

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2012

DocketEntry: CIVIL ADDITIONAL DEF'S ASSESSED $2.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
07/16/2010

DocketEntry: SUMS RTD SVD DIAN M BRETHOUR 07-12-10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2010

DocketEntry: SUMS RTD SVD JEROME F BRETHOUR 07-12-10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $2.50 BY: CITIMORTGAGE INC , ON 07/02/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $60.00 BY: CITIMORTGAGE INC , ON 07/02/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $905.00 BY: CITIMORTGAGE INC , ON 07/02/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR3330 PG 131

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY / MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less