This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 09/24/2022 at 10:01:10 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A., NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY vs. RAYFIELD, DARON

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 CITIBANK, N A , NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against RAYFIELD, DARON. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1302

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A., NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

Defendants

RAYFIELD, DARON

SQUIRES, ROY H.

SQUIRES, CHERYL D.

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHERYL D. SQUIRES

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROY H. SQUIRES, N/K/A MICHELLE SQUIRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERACI, NICHOLAS AUGUST

Defendant Attorney

GILBERT, GREGORY S

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

11/17/2021: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/17/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

11/17/2021: VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.5501.1823 / 2022020999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (ROY SQUIRES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT // ENTERED AGAINST DARON RAYFIELD & UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROY H. SQUIRES, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY TO DETERMINE MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO DARON RAYFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/18/2021 FOR SQUIRES, ROY H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/18/2021 FOR RAYFIELD, DARON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/18/2021 FOR SQUIRES, CHERYL D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: GERACI, NICHOLAS AUGUST ASSIGNED TO CITIBANK, N.A., NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/17/2021 CASE NUMBER CA21-1302

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE OF CRZ PASS-THROUGH TRUST VI is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILBERT, GREGORY S