Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 19:48:06 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs. SCHEMER, MARTIN I

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCHEMER, MARTIN I. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0644

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

SCHEMER, MARTIN I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY L

 

Court Documents

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON 12/12/2019 FOR MARTIN I. SCHEMER

12/20/2019: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON 12/12/2019 FOR MARTIN I. SCHEMER

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/20/2019 - MARTIN I SCHEMER

8/20/2019: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/20/2019 - MARTIN I SCHEMER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

7/12/2019: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

4/23/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULDE NOT BE DISMISSED AND PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PREFECT SERVICE

2/1/2019: SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULDE NOT BE DISMISSED AND PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PREFECT SERVICE

NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

1/29/2019: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR MARTIN I SCHEMER

12/28/2017: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR MARTIN I SCHEMER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

12/18/2017: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/12/2017 FOR MARTIN I SCHEMER

6/12/2017: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/12/2017 FOR MARTIN I SCHEMER

COMPLAINT

6/12/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON 12/12/2019 FOR MARTIN I. SCHEMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019028924

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/20/2019 - MARTIN I SCHEMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: KAHN, JEFFREY L REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-0644, CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS. SCHEMER, MARTIN I WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: E SERVICED TO PARTIES LISTED: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL; Judge: SMITH, R. LEE; Location: Chambers; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULDE NOT BE DISMISSED AND PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PREFECT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: KAHN, JEFFREY L REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-0644, CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS. SCHEMER, MARTIN I WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION - 1/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONTRACT AND INDEBTNESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/12/2017 FOR MARTIN I SCHEMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: KAHN, JEFFREY L ASSIGNED TO CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/12/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-0644

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHN, JEFFREY LEE