This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/06/2021 at 09:08:34 (UTC).

CASTANEDA, MAXIMO vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 CASTANEDA, MAXIMO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0565

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASTANEDA, MAXIMO

CASTANEDA, LINDA

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERTSON, PETER A

BENNETT, JACKLYN

BENNETT, JACKLYN G

Defendant Attorneys

PETERFRIEND, WILLIAM J

DUNHAM, DEANA NICOLE

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

1/25/2021: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

7/9/2020: CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

7/9/2020: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 05/29/2020 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

6/4/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 05/29/2020 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/26/2020 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

5/26/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/26/2020 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020013869

5/21/2020: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020013869

ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

5/20/2020: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/20/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/20/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL DOCKET SOUNDING; Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL DOCKET SOUNDING; Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.5162.1315 / 2021009336)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: DUNHAM, DEANA NICOLE; BENNETT, JACKLYN REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0565, CASTANEDA, MAXIMO VS. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE -11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE - DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR NOVEMBER 29, 2021 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/26/2020 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020013869

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BENNETT, JACKLYN ASSIGNED TO CASTANEDA, MAXIMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BENNETT, JACKLYN ASSIGNED TO CASTANEDA, LINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ROBERTSON, PETER A ASSIGNED TO CASTANEDA, MAXIMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/20/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0565

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENNETT, JACKLYN G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTSON, PETER ARNOLD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENNETT, JACKLYN