This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 06/20/2023 at 21:23:38 (UTC).

GREEN, CRYSTAL vs. TAYLOR, DAVID THOMAS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 GREEN, CRYSTAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TAYLOR, DAVID THOMAS. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0696

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN, CRYSTAL

Defendant

TAYLOR, DAVID THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEAIRD, ROBERT LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

3/21/2023: COMPLAINT

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/23/2023: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

3/23/2023: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023012710

3/23/2023: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023012710

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

5/17/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

5/17/2023: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

5/17/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

5/17/2023: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023023681

5/23/2023: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023023681

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/23/2023 FOR TAYLOR, DAVID THOMAS

5/23/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/23/2023 FOR TAYLOR, DAVID THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

05/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/23/2023 FOR TAYLOR, DAVID THOMAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: LEAIRD, ROBERT LAWRENCE ASSIGNED TO GREEN, CRYSTAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023023681

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID THOMAS TAYLOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023012710

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: JAFFE, MARTIN J REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-0696, GREEN, CRYSTAL VS. TAYLOR, DAVID THOMAS WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-3/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketEntry: COULD NOT PARSE DOCKET CODE TEXT FOR DOCKETCODE = CIVILATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/22/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-0696

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less