This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 12/09/2023 at 14:44:29 (UTC).

ARISSA, NILSA vs. CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT ST. JOHNS COUNTY, FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 08/25/2023 ARISSA, NILSA filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT ST JOHNS COUNTY, FLORIDA. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WESTON, KATHRYN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1717

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WESTON, KATHRYN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARISSA, NILSA

Defendant

CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT ST. JOHNS COUNTY, FLORIDA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/25/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/25/2023: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR A PARTY NOT REPRESENTED BY AN ATTORNEY

8/25/2023: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR A PARTY NOT REPRESENTED BY AN ATTORNEY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/25/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 59

8/25/2023: AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 59

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023040170

9/7/2023: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023040170

ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

9/22/2023: ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

 

Docket Entries

09/22/2023

DocketEntry: JUDGE WESTON, KATHRYN D: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ARISSA, NILSA REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-1717, ARISSA, NILSA VS. CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT ST. JOHNS COUNTY, FLORIDA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT-9/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023040170

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ARISSA, NILSA REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-1717, ARISSA, NILSA VS. CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT ST. JOHNS COUNTY, FLORIDA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AMENDED STANDING ORDER - 8/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 59

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR A PARTY NOT REPRESENTED BY AN ATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEntry: JUDGE JANESK, KENNETH J: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/25/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-1717

[+] Read More [-] Read Less