This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2023 at 19:08:26 (UTC).

MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. vs. FUTURE AESTHETICS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2023 MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FUTURE AESTHETICS LLC. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1358

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Defendant

FUTURE AESTHETICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDEMAN, WILLIAM M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/8/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/8/2023: COMPLAINT

AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

5/9/2023: AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

6/13/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/13/2023: AMENDED COMPLAINT

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/16/2023 FOR FUTURE AESTHETICS LLC

6/16/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/16/2023 FOR FUTURE AESTHETICS LLC

OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

6/22/2023: OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

7/19/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/16/2023 FOR FUTURE AESTHETICS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023027802

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023021639

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: LINDEMAN, WILLIAM M REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-1358, MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC. VS. FUTURE AESTHETICS LLC WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55-5/9/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/09/2023 FOR FUTURE AESTHETICS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: LINDEMAN, WILLIAM M ASSIGNED TO MERZ NORTH AMERICA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/09/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-1358

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less