This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 11/27/2023 at 18:07:46 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs. UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES CREDITORS

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES CREDITORS. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANESK, KENNETH J II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1822

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANESK, KENNETH J II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES CREDITORS

BAGGETT, LELAND H. JR

RAMSEY, PATRICIA ANNE

BRCKA, DEBORAH BAGGETT

KITAYAMA BOYD, DENA KAYE

KITAYAMA, MARK STEPHEN

PRICE, MICHELLE ANN

LISLE, MICHAEL LESLIE JR

LISLE, RICHARD KEVIN

REGAN, HOLLY LYNN

PORTER, LORI BAGGET

BOWERS, DIANA LYNN

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

THE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF CYPRESS LAKES INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHURCH, KELLEY L

Defendant Attorney

SHEARER, JAY RYAN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER / LORI BAGGETT PORTER (MAILED)

11/20/2023: ANSWER / LORI BAGGETT PORTER (MAILED)

ANSWER - DENA KAYA KITAYAMA-BOYD

11/7/2023: ANSWER - DENA KAYA KITAYAMA-BOYD

DEFENDANT, THE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF CYPRESS LAKES, INC.ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

11/1/2023: DEFENDANT, THE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF CYPRESS LAKES, INC.ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/1/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER- DIANA L BOWERS

10/31/2023: ANSWER- DIANA L BOWERS

ANSWER- MARK STEPHEN KITAYAMA

10/30/2023: ANSWER- MARK STEPHEN KITAYAMA

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSE

10/20/2023: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSE

AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 59

9/28/2023: AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 59

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.5832.1178. / 2023076716)

9/28/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.5832.1178. / 2023076716)

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

9/28/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

9/28/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR THE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF CYPRESS LAKES INC

9/28/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR THE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF CYPRESS LAKES INC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

9/28/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR BOWERS, DIANA LYNN

9/28/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR BOWERS, DIANA LYNN

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR PORTER, LORI BAGGET

9/28/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR PORTER, LORI BAGGET

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR REGAN, HOLLY LYNN

9/28/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR REGAN, HOLLY LYNN

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR LISLE, RICHARD KEVIN

9/28/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR LISLE, RICHARD KEVIN

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR LISLE, MICHAEL LESLIE JR

9/28/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR LISLE, MICHAEL LESLIE JR

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ANSWER / LORI BAGGETT PORTER (MAILED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ANSWER - DENA KAYA KITAYAMA-BOYD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SHEARER, JAY RYAN ASSIGNED TO THE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF CYPRESS LAKES INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, THE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF CYPRESS LAKES, INC.ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ANSWER- DIANA L BOWERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ANSWER- MARK STEPHEN KITAYAMA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: J.A. REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-1822, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS. UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES CREDITORS DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSE -10/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,065.00 RECEIPT #2023043486

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR BAGGETT, LELAND H. JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/28/2023 FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: CHURCH, KELLEY L ASSIGNED TO THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketEntry: JUDGE JANESK, KENNETH J: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/28/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-1822

[+] Read More [-] Read Less