This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 05/09/2023 at 12:20:45 (UTC).

CAPO, VICTORIA LYNN vs. CAPO, DANIEL WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 06/10/2002 CAPO, VICTORIA LYNN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAPO, DANIEL WILLIAM. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ALEXANDER, JOHN and PRUGH, R MITCHELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1206

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ALEXANDER, JOHN

PRUGH, R MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPO, VICTORIA LYNN

Defendant

CAPO, DANIEL WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2017

DocketEntry: BALANCE ADJUSTMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

DocketEntry: DOR TRANSMITTAL INTERCEPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

DocketEntry: DOR TRANSMITTAL INTERCEPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2017

DocketEntry: TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2017

DocketEntry: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF JUDICIAL HEARING OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2017

HearingEvent: IVD CHILD SUPPORT HEARING; Judge: PRUGH, R MITCHELL; Location: Courtroom 228; Result: COMPLETED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2017

DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2017

DocketEntry: COURT NOTES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2017

DocketEntry: COMPUTATION OF ARREARAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2017

DocketEntry: IVD CHILD SUPPORT HEARING SET FOR 04/27/2017 AT 8:30 AM IN 228/ , JDG: PRUGH, R MITCHELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
122 More Docket Entries
06/19/2002

DocketEntry: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS/SUMS ISSUEDTO SO/061902YR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: CLERK CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY/061002 CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY/061002 CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED/061002 CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: COPY OF WIFE DRIVER LICENSE/061002 CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: WIFE NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER/061002 CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT/061002CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: WIFE'S FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/061002 CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET/061002 CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2002

DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENTOF MINOR CHILDREN/061002 CPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less