This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 08/10/2023 at 02:19:20 (UTC).

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP. vs. WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 NAVITAS CREDIT CORP filed an Other lawsuit against WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WOOLSEY, CASEY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3515

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WOOLSEY, CASEY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP.

Defendants

WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC

DAVID, ALICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZWIEBEL, ERIC BRET

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/9/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/11/2023 FOR WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC

5/11/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/11/2023 FOR WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/11/2023 FOR DAVID, ALICIA

5/11/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/11/2023 FOR DAVID, ALICIA

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/11/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 06/23/2023 FOR WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC

7/21/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 06/23/2023 FOR WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 06/23/2023 FOR DAVID, ALICIA

7/21/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 06/23/2023 FOR DAVID, ALICIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 06/23/2023 FOR DAVID, ALICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 06/23/2023 FOR WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/11/2023 FOR DAVID, ALICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/11/2023 FOR WISTERIA MASSAGE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023021689

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ZWIEBEL, ERIC BRET ASSIGNED TO NAVITAS CREDIT CORP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE WOOLSEY, CASEY L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/10/2023 CASE NUMBER CC23-3515

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less