Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 08/19/2020 at 19:10:13 (UTC).

BRODA, JESSICA vs. BANK OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 BRODA, JESSICA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0579

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRODA, DAVID

BRODA, JESSICA

Defendant

BANK OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TROGOLO, MELANIE

ANDERSON, GREGORY ANDREW

WHITNEY, NICHOLAS PRICE

Defendant Attorney

SERRADET, SAHILY

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

6/10/2020: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS

6/10/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR BANK OF AMERICA

6/2/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/02/2020 FOR BANK OF AMERICA

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

5/22/2020: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

5/21/2020: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/21/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: SMITH, R. LEE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0579, BRODA, JESSICA VS. BANK OF AMERICA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY-7/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: JA - TRACI DAVIS- REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0579, BRODA, JESSICA VS. BANK OF AMERICA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: W215-6/24/2020 - PLAINIFF'S NOTICE FOR AND MOTION TO SET JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE FOR AND MOTION TO SET JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SERRADET, SAHILY ASSIGNED TO BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020014003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: TROGOLO, MELANIE ASSIGNED TO BRODA, JESSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/21/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0579

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAHILY SERRADET