This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/24/2023 at 03:49:29 (UTC).

BRACKETT, CHRISTINE ELIZABETH vs. BRACKETT, WILLIAM WERNER

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 BRACKETT, CHRISTINE ELIZABETH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRACKETT, WILLIAM WERNER. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2174

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRACKETT, CHRISTINE ELIZABETH

Respondent

BRACKETT, WILLIAM WERNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA

Respondent Attorneys

1 HAYES, JULIAN A

0 HAYES, JULIAN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Zoom

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY) SET FOR 03/22/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN ZOOM/ , JDG: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA REGARDING SERVICE OF FAMILY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Zoom; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF COURSE COMPLETION - WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FLA. FAM. LAW R. P. 12.285

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Zoom; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ATTORNEY ON 12/12/2022 FOR BRACKETT, WILLIAM WERNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: CORRESPONDENCE - HARBOR CITY LAW\

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA ASSIGNED TO BRACKETT, CHRISTINE ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/12/2022 CASE NUMBER DR22-2174

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less