This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 22:18:36 (UTC).

BFS GROUP LLC vs. ALL HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 BFS GROUP LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ALL HOMES LLC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2903

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BFS GROUP LLC

Defendants

ALL HOMES LLC

RESCOM GROUP INC

MCLEOD, JEREMY T

EZELLE, EDGAR A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAFT, SCOTT REUBEN

 

Court Documents

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR ALL HOMES LLC

9/13/2022: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR ALL HOMES LLC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR RESCOM GROUP INC

9/13/2022: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR RESCOM GROUP INC

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR MCLEOD, JEREMY T

9/13/2022: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR MCLEOD, JEREMY T

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR EZELLE, EDGAR A

9/13/2022: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR EZELLE, EDGAR A

COMPLAINT

9/13/2022: COMPLAINT

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/13/2022: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

10/11/2022: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

DEFAULT - NOT ENTERED NO PROOF OF SERVICE

10/17/2022: DEFAULT - NOT ENTERED NO PROOF OF SERVICE

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 9/20/2022 FOR RESCOM GROUP INC- REGISTERED AGENT

10/18/2022: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 9/20/2022 FOR RESCOM GROUP INC- REGISTERED AGENT

DEFAULT AGAINST RESCOM GROUP ENTERED

10/18/2022: DEFAULT AGAINST RESCOM GROUP ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST RESCOM GROUP

10/19/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST RESCOM GROUP

NOTICE OF HEARING - NOVEMBER 16, 2022 AT 11:15 AM

10/20/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING - NOVEMBER 16, 2022 AT 11:15 AM

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 10/21/2022 FOR ALL HOMES LLC - REGISTERED AGENT

11/2/2022: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 10/21/2022 FOR ALL HOMES LLC - REGISTERED AGENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 206; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED (OR.5665.1500. / 2022105284)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 10/21/2022 FOR ALL HOMES LLC - REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - NOVEMBER 16, 2022 AT 11:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST RESCOM GROUP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT AGAINST RESCOM GROUP ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 9/20/2022 FOR RESCOM GROUP INC- REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR EZELLE, EDGAR A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR MCLEOD, JEREMY T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR RESCOM GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/13/2022 FOR ALL HOMES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HAFT, SCOTT REUBEN ASSIGNED TO BFS GROUP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TINLIN, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/13/2022 CASE NUMBER CC22-2903

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less