This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/03/2023 at 09:20:37 (UTC).

ARDARY, MONICA M. vs. ARDARY, JOHN M JR

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 ARDARY, MONICA M filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ARDARY, JOHN M JR. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1917

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARDARY, MONICA M.

Respondent

ARDARY, JOHN M JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA

Respondent Attorney

ERLINGER, JENNIFER MICHELE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: INJUNCTION HEARING; Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DISMISSING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: DIV 58 JA - FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT AMENDED MOTION FOR WITNESS TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED MOTION FOR WITNESS TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • HearingEvent: INJUNCTION HEARING; Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: RESET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA; ERLINGER, JENNIFER MICHELE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CONSENT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: DIV 58 J.A. AND INJ CLERK MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: DIV 58 JA FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT PETITION FOR INJUNCTION - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR INJUNCTION - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA ASSIGNED TO ARDARY, MONICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/01/2022 CASE NUMBER DR22-1917

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less