This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 06/11/2023 at 19:22:12 (UTC).

ANDERSON, VICTORIA vs. ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 ANDERSON, VICTORIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ST JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0295

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDERSON, VICTORIA

A.C. (MINOR CHILD)

Defendants

ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

PLAYCORE HOLDINGS, INC.

GAMETIME, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATTERSON, MARK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/10/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/10/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

3/13/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR PLAYCORE HOLDINGS, INC.

3/13/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR PLAYCORE HOLDINGS, INC.

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR GAMETIME, LLC

3/13/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR GAMETIME, LLC

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/13/2023: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

3/13/2023: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

COMPLAINT

3/10/2023: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2023010261

3/15/2023: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2023010261

SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 05/23/2023 FOR ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

6/1/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 05/23/2023 FOR ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/1/2023: AMENDED COMPLAINT

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 05/23/2023 FOR PLAYCORE HOLDINGS, INC.

6/1/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 05/23/2023 FOR PLAYCORE HOLDINGS, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 05/23/2023 FOR PLAYCORE HOLDINGS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 05/23/2023 FOR ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2023010261

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: PATTERSON, MARK REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-0295, ANDERSON, VICTORIA VS. ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -3/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR GAMETIME, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR PLAYCORE HOLDINGS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR ST. JOHNS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/13/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-0295

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less