This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/28/2022 at 03:17:39 (UTC).

ANDERSON, TRACIE vs. ANDERSON, DAVID BUCK

Case Summary

On 08/02/2000 ANDERSON, TRACIE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ANDERSON, DAVID BUCK. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALEXANDER, JOHN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1495

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALEXANDER, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON, TRACIE

Defendant

ANDERSON, DAVID BUCK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/01/2000

DocketEntry: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION/090800/CF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2000

DocketEntry: ORDER CONTINUING TEMPORARY INJ/050201 SM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2000

DocketEntry: CERTIFIED TEMP INJUNCTION - DOM VIOLENCE RTD SVD 8-2-00DAVID B ANDERSON /080700-TLM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2000

DocketEntry: TEMP INJUNCTION - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE /080300-TLM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2000

DocketEntry: AFFID/WAIVER OF FEES/ CLERK CERT OF INDIGENCY /080300TLM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2000

DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /080300-TLM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2000

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET /080300-TLM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2000

DocketEntry: PETITION FOR INJUNCTION - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE /080300-TLM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less