Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 22:47:08 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs. PERKINS, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERKINS, THOMAS. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0193

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

PERKINS, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT E

 

Court Documents

ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

2/18/2020: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/18/2020 FOR PERKINS, THOMAS

2/18/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/18/2020 FOR PERKINS, THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT - Recorded (OR.5028.543 / 2020072773)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MODLIN, SCOTT E REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0193, AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS. PERKINS, THOMAS:AGREED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT -8/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 07/31/2020 FOR PERKINS, THOMAS BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MODLIN, SCOTT E REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0193, AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS. PERKINS, THOMAS: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO -7/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DUE TO COVID-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020005790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/18/2020 FOR PERKINS, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MODLIN, SCOTT E ASSIGNED TO AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK FKA AMERICAN EXPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/18/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0193

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric