This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 12/16/2021 at 18:43:34 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB vs. DANKWORTH, SHANE

Case Summary

On 08/30/2010 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANKWORTH, SHANE. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2386

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendant

DANKWORTH, SHANE

 

Court Documents

8/30/2010

2: 8/30/2010

 

Docket Entries

12/20/2010

DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2010

DocketEntry: DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2010

DocketEntry: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2010

DocketEntry: STIP FOR SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2010

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2010

DocketEntry: SUMS RTD SVD SHANE DANKWORTH 09-20-10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2010

DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2010

DocketEntry: ANSWER /SHANE DANWORTH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2010

DocketEntry: FILING FEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $10.00 BY: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, ON 08/30/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $400.00 BY: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, ON 08/30/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2010

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2010
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less