Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 13:45:38 (UTC).

A.J. WELLS ROOFING CONTRACTORS A/A/O DEANA MARIE S vs. HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 A J WELLS ROOFING CONTRACTORS A/A/O DEANA MARIE S filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1142

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.J. WELLS ROOFING CONTRACTORS A/A/O DEANA MARIE S

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUSH, STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

ORDER UPON FILING

10/10/2017: ORDER UPON FILING

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/10/2017 - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

10/10/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/10/2017 - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017033806

10/10/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017033806

COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/5/2017: COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/5/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4463.1258 / 2017077827)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/10/2017 - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017033806

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BUSH, STEVEN MICHAEL ASSIGNED TO A.J. WELLS ROOFING CONTRACTORS A/A/O DEANA MARIE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: OTHER CIVIL ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/06/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1142

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bush, Steven Michael