Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:13:24 (UTC).

AFFAN, ASHRAF vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/28/2017 AFFAN, ASHRAF filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL and SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1410

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFFAN, ASHRAF

GHANDOUR, AZZA

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNESEN, JAY M

Defendant Attorneys

KAPLE, JOSEPH KURT

GUTTERMAN, MARC J

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4693.410 / 2019016957)

3/12/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4693.410 / 2019016957)

MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT

1/4/2019: MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT

PLAINITFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

8/16/2018: PLAINITFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

OBJECTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO DEPOSITION OF OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

7/16/2018: OBJECTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO DEPOSITION OF OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

3/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

3/20/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

3/20/2018: NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT / OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

2/13/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT / OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO ASHRAF AFFAN AND AZZA GHANDOUR

1/14/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO ASHRAF AFFAN AND AZZA GHANDOUR

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO ASHRAF AFFAN AND AZZA GHANDOUR

1/14/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO ASHRAF AFFAN AND AZZA GHANDOUR

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

12/28/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

12/28/2017: PLAINTIFFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

12/28/2017: COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL DOCKET SOUNDING; Judge: SMITH, R. LEE; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4693.410 / 2019016957)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ARNESEN, JAY M; GUTTERMAN, MARC J REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-1410, AFFAN, ASHRAF VS. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE-12/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: 2ND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF FLORIDA OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY - RULE 1.720(E)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ARNESEN, JAY M ASSIGNED TO GHANDOUR, AZZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ARNESEN, JAY M ASSIGNED TO AFFAN, ASHRAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/28/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1410

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gutterman, Marc Jason