Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 15:03:41 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC vs. KEANE, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEANE, SANDRA. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1198

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

KEANE, SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/09/2021 FOR KEANE, SANDRA

4/9/2021: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/09/2021 FOR KEANE, SANDRA

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

4/9/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/9/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021012674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/09/2021 FOR KEANE, SANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 06/28/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN 216/ , JDG: TINLIN, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SCHERR, HAROLD EARL ASSIGNED TO ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TINLIN, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER SP21-1198

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL