Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 02:36:26 (UTC).

7777777, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY vs. CANNON, V

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 7777777, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CANNON, V. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL and MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1100

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

7777777, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

CANNON, V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUMMINGS, ANDREW P

 

Court Documents

AMENDED FINAL ORDER

4/4/2018: AMENDED FINAL ORDER

FINAL ORDER

4/2/2018: FINAL ORDER

CIVIL COURT NOTES

3/5/2018: CIVIL COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

1/19/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

11/2/2017: ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

CIVIL COURT NOTES

10/31/2017: CIVIL COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF PAYMENT RIGHTS AND NOTICE OF HEARING (10/31/2017 @ 8:45 A.M.)

9/28/2017: NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF PAYMENT RIGHTS AND NOTICE OF HEARING (10/31/2017 @ 8:45 A.M.)

COMPLAINT

9/26/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: CUMMINGS, ANDREW P; LEE, SUNG; BEARDSLEY, BRANDON REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-1100, 7777777, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS. CANNON, V WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AMENDED FINAL ORDER-4/4/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED FINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: CUMMINGS, ANDREW P; LEE, SUNG; BEARDSLEY, BRANDON REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-1100, 7777777, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS. CANNON, V WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: FINAL ORDER-4/2/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - MARCH 5, 2018 @ 2:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (FAMILY); Judge: MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR; Location: Chambers; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, ANSWER AND CONSENT TO RELIEF / V. CANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF PAYMENT RIGHTS AND NOTICE OF HEARING (10/31/2017 @ 8:45 A.M.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017032529

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: CUMMINGS, ANDREW P ASSIGNED TO 7777777, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: OTHER CIVIL ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/26/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1100

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMMINGS , ANDREW