Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 19:27:26 (UTC).

XPRESS RESTORATION INC -VS- SECURITY FIRST INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 XPRESS RESTORATION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INS CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0175

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XPRESS RESTORATION INC

2601 S Bayshore Drive, 18Th Floor

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

OSCAR ROBLES

CAROLINE ORBEZO

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INS CO

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIELA BARRETO

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS BALLARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

06/25/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

06/19/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

NOTICE OF HEARING 6/5/20 9:30AM (AMENDED)

06/01/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING 6/5/20 9:30AM (AMENDED)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 6/5/20 @ 9:15 AM CTRM B

04/13/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 6/5/20 @ 9:15 AM CTRM B

MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

03/06/2020: MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL -DENNIS BALLARD OBO DEFT

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL -DENNIS BALLARD OBO DEFT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS FOR LACK OF STANDING OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT

02/11/2020: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS FOR LACK OF STANDING OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SECURITY FIRST INS CO 1/22/20

01/22/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SECURITY FIRST INS CO 1/22/20

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/16/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED SECURITY FIRST INS CO

01/16/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED SECURITY FIRST INS CO

COMPLAINT FILED

01/16/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

01/16/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT

01/16/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION TO DEFT

01/16/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION TO DEFT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 6/5/20 9:30AM (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 6/5/20 @ 9:15 AM CTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS FOR LACK OF STANDING OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL -DENNIS BALLARD OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SECURITY FIRST INS CO 1/22/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED SECURITY FIRST INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Xpress Restoration Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DENNIS BALLARD