Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/21/2021 at 18:39:08 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY F -VS- YVETTE A BELL

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY F filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against YVETTE A BELL. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA L. MCINTOSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1956

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA L. MCINTOSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

P. O. Box 551

Bradenton, FL 34206

BCMB1 TRUST

Defendants

ALVIA A BELL

Sanford, FL 32771

YVETTE A BELL

Sanford, FL 32771

YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL

ALVIA BELL

YVETTE BELL

ALVIA ANDRE BELL

ROCKY TOMLIN

BOBBY J WASHINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT SCHERMER

Defendant Attorney

RASHEED ALLEN

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION BY DEFT YVETTE A BELL

09/24/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION BY DEFT YVETTE A BELL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY RASHEED KARIM ALLEN OBO DEFT YVETTE BELL

09/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY RASHEED KARIM ALLEN OBO DEFT YVETTE BELL

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANT #2 NKA ROCY TOMLIN 9/3/20

09/10/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANT #2 NKA ROCY TOMLIN 9/3/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANT #1 NKA BOBBY J WASHINGTON 9/3/20

09/10/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANT #1 NKA BOBBY J WASHINGTON 9/3/20

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNK SPOUSE OF YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL

09/10/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNK SPOUSE OF YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL 9/3/20

09/10/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL 9/3/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ALVIA A BELL AKA ALVIA BELL AKA ALIVIA ANDRE BELL 8/21/20

09/04/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ALVIA A BELL AKA ALVIA BELL AKA ALIVIA ANDRE BELL 8/21/20

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/14/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE SHEET

08/14/2020: VALUE SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/14/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATE AS TO ORIG PROM NOTE

08/14/2020: CERTIFICATE AS TO ORIG PROM NOTE

COMPLAINT FILED

08/14/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL

08/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL

SUMMONS ISSUED - ALVIA A BELL AKA ALVIA BELL AKA ALVIA ANDRE BELL

08/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - ALVIA A BELL AKA ALVIA BELL AKA ALVIA ANDRE BELL

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL

08/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #1

08/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

08/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION BY DEFT YVETTE A BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY RASHEED KARIM ALLEN OBO DEFT YVETTE BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL 9/3/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNK SPOUSE OF YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANT #1 NKA BOBBY J WASHINGTON 9/3/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANT #2 NKA ROCY TOMLIN 9/3/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ALVIA A BELL AKA ALVIA BELL AKA ALIVIA ANDRE BELL 8/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ALVIA A BELL AKA ALVIA BELL AKA ALVIA ANDRE BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - YVETTE A BELL AKA YVETTE BELL AKA YVETTE ANTOINETTE BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO ORIG PROM NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020089391

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BCMB1 TRUST AKA is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASHEED ALLEN