Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 19:29:26 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA -VS- MIA COLEMAN BAKER

Case Summary

On 02/17/2020 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MIA COLEMAN BAKER. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MELANIE CHASE and JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0393

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MELANIE CHASE

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

1615 South Congress Avenue

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Defendants

USA DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

400 N. Tampa Street

Tampa, FL 33602

JAMIK BAKER

Sanford, FL 32771

MIA COLEMAN BAKER

Sanford, FL 32771

CELERY ESTATES NORTH HOA INC

3112 West Lake Mary Blvd

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSRAT MANSOOR

Defendant Attorney

JOHN RUDY III

 

Court Documents

DISCLAIMER CONDITIONAL BY USA OBO HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

04/21/2020: DISCLAIMER CONDITIONAL BY USA OBO HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFTS JAMIK BAKER & MIA COLEMAN BAKER

03/17/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFTS JAMIK BAKER & MIA COLEMAN BAKER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MIA COLEMAN BAKER 2/21/20

02/27/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MIA COLEMAN BAKER 2/21/20

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT 1

02/27/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT 1

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT 2

02/27/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT 2

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JAMIK BAKER 2/21/20

02/27/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JAMIK BAKER 2/21/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED CELERY ESTATES NORTH HOA INC 2/21/20

02/27/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED CELERY ESTATES NORTH HOA INC 2/21/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED USA DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT 2/24/20

02/27/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED USA DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT 2/24/20

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/17/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/17/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020018077

02/17/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020018077

VALUE SHEET

02/17/2020: VALUE SHEET

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY ALDRIDGE PITE OBO PLTF

02/17/2020: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY ALDRIDGE PITE OBO PLTF

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT 2

02/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT 1

02/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED - CELERY ESTATES NORTH HOA INC

02/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - CELERY ESTATES NORTH HOA INC

SUMMONS ISSUED - USA DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

02/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - USA DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED - MIA COLEMAN BAKER

02/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - MIA COLEMAN BAKER

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketREASSIGNED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 20-30-S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLAIMER CONDITIONAL BY USA OBO HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFTS JAMIK BAKER & MIA COLEMAN BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED USA DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT 2/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED CELERY ESTATES NORTH HOA INC 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JAMIK BAKER 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MIA COLEMAN BAKER 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MIA COLEMAN BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - JAMIK BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - USA DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CELERY ESTATES NORTH HOA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY ALDRIDGE PITE OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020018077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANSOOR , NUSRAT