This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/11/2021 at 17:13:06 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA -VS- JOSHUA J RIVERA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSHUA J RIVERA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3168

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

JOSHUA J RIVERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARIA ENGLE

Defendant Attorney

ANDREW STEELE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

09/30/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20D - JOSHUA J RIVERA ON 9/23/21

09/23/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20D - JOSHUA J RIVERA ON 9/23/21

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/20/21

09/20/2021: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/20/21

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

09/17/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA J ROVERA

2021-09-17 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA J ROVERA

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

09/17/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

09/17/2021: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/17/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20D - JOSHUA J RIVERA ON 9/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA J ROVERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEELE ANDREW C