Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/13/2021 at 17:30:42 (UTC).

WATERVUE APARTMENTS LLC -VS- CRYSTAL WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 WATERVUE APARTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CRYSTAL WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0723

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WATERVUE APARTMENTS LLC

WATERVUE AT LONGWOOD APARTMENT HOMES

Defendant

CRYSTAL WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D CRYSTAL WILLIAMS 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION & DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D CRYSTAL WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATERVUE AT LONGWOOD APARTMENT HOMES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON