This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/14/2020 at 14:10:21 (UTC).

WAGNERS EXCAVATING LP -VS- DAN WILLIAM FENIMORE

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 WAGNERS EXCAVATING LP filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against DAN WILLIAM FENIMORE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA D. SOUTO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0172

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA D. SOUTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAGNERS EXCAVATING LP

7233 Pecan Ct

Mansfield, TX 76063

Defendants

DAN WILLIAM FENIMORE

Lake Mary, FL 32746

SHANNON L FENIMORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

T PETRINO

 

Court Documents

REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED TO DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE

02/07/2020: REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED TO DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE

CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT / TEXAS Instrument: 2020009036

01/24/2020: CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT / TEXAS Instrument: 2020009036

AFFIDAVIT FOR RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2020009037

01/24/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2020009037

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JGM BY PLTF ATTY

01/24/2020: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JGM BY PLTF ATTY

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT TO: DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE BY DEPUTY CLERK

01/27/2020: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT TO: DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE BY DEPUTY CLERK

RECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL TO DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE

01/28/2020: RECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL TO DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED TO DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL TO DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT TO: DAN WILLIAM & SHANNON L FENIMORE BY DEPUTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JGM BY PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2020009037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT / TEXAS Instrument: 2020009036

    Read MoreRead Less