This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 03:28:42 (UTC).

VILLAS AT LAKESIDE CONDO ASSN INC -VS- RYESTONE LLC

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 VILLAS AT LAKESIDE CONDO ASSN INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RYESTONE LLC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2739

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAS AT LAKESIDE CONDO ASSN INC

1950 Summer Club Dr

Oviedo, FL 32765

Defendants

PC UNITS LLC

Patrick Carr, 1007 N Federal Highway Ste 323

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

RYESTONE LLC

Scott Jaffee Pa, 1835 Ne Miami Gardens Dr Ste 210

North Miami, FL 33179

JENNIFER FERREIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLAS RANKIN

Defendant Attorney

PAMELA CHAVEZ

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST RYESTONE LLC

12/22/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST RYESTONE LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE - UNK TENANT 1

12/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE - UNK TENANT 1

RETURNED MAIL - ORDER - UNABLE TO FWD

02/25/2021: RETURNED MAIL - ORDER - UNABLE TO FWD

EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION DATED 1/28/21 MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & AMENDED JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BY DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 1 AKA JENNIFER FERREIRA

02/03/2021: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION DATED 1/28/21 MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & AMENDED JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BY DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 1 AKA JENNIFER FERREIRA

RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION & MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

02/03/2021: RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION & MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST UNK TENANT 2

12/16/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST UNK TENANT 2

RETURNED MAIL - FJ - UNABLE TO FWD

02/05/2021: RETURNED MAIL - FJ - UNABLE TO FWD

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING AS MOOT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/5/21

02/08/2021: ORDER CANCELLING HEARING AS MOOT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/5/21

ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY / HEARING ON 2/11/21 @ 10 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/4/21

02/04/2021: ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY / HEARING ON 2/11/21 @ 10 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/4/21

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL - ORDER - UNABLE TO FWD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL - ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY STAY - UNABLE TO FWD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL - AMND FJ - UNABLE TO FWD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED UNSERVED -POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • HearingTYPE: EVICTION HEARING; DATE / TIME: 02/11/2021 / 1000 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: JAMES J. DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING HEARING AS MOOT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/5/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL - FJ - UNABLE TO FWD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EMERGENCY TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION 1/28/21 MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & AMENDED JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BY DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT AKA JENNIFER FERREIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY / HEARING ON 2/11/21 @ 10 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCALENDAR: EH HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 02/11/2021 AT 1000AM

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE - UNK TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANT 2 12/2/20 (NO NAME GIVEN) 5 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANT 1 ( NO NAME GIVEN) (5DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED RYESTONE LLC 12/1/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D PC UNITS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D RYESTONE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ryestone LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PC UNITS LLC is a litigant