This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 00:26:14 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATIO -VS- RITA DE LA TORRE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATIO filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against RITA DE LA TORRE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1951

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST C/O US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSN

Defendants

RITA DE LA TORRE

LILIANA DE LA TORRE

THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

HIDDEN VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

JORGE DE LA TORRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEENA DIAZ

Defendant Attorneys

KEVIN KYLE

SOLANGE SWITZER

JOYCE FULLER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACTION TO UNK TENANT NO 1 UNK TENANT NO 2

11/23/2022: NOTICE OF ACTION TO UNK TENANT NO 1 UNK TENANT NO 2

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MTG FORECLOSURE BY DEFTS LILIANA DE LA TORRE & RITA DE LA TORRE

11/14/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MTG FORECLOSURE BY DEFTS LILIANA DE LA TORRE & RITA DE LA TORRE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

11/23/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

11/23/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED HIDDEN VILLAGE CONDO ASSN INC 8/25/22

10/30/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED HIDDEN VILLAGE CONDO ASSN INC 8/25/22

DESIGNATION/DIRECTIONS TO CLERK BY PLTF

10/31/2022: DESIGNATION/DIRECTIONS TO CLERK BY PLTF

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE/DILIGENT SEARCH OF DEFT UNK TENANT NO 1

10/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE/DILIGENT SEARCH OF DEFT UNK TENANT NO 1

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE/DILIGENT SEARCH OF DEFT UNK TENANT NO 2

10/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE/DILIGENT SEARCH OF DEFT UNK TENANT NO 2

NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PLTF

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PLTF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

08/12/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022095925

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022095925

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

08/12/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

08/12/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

SUMMONS ISSUED - HIDDEN VILLAGE CONDO ASSN INC

08/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - HIDDEN VILLAGE CONDO ASSN INC

SUMMONS ISSUED - LILIANA DE LA TORRE

08/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - LILIANA DE LA TORRE

SUMMONS ISSUED - RITA DE LA TORRE

08/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - RITA DE LA TORRE

SUMMONS ISSUED - THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSN INC

08/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSN INC

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION TO UNK TENANT NO 1 UNK TENANT NO 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MTG FORECLOSURE BY DEFTS LILIANA DE LA TORRE & RITA DE LA TORRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE/DILIGENT SEARCH OF DEFT UNK TENANT NO 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE/DILIGENT SEARCH OF DEFT UNK TENANT NO 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION/DIRECTIONS TO CLERK BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED HIDDEN VILLAGE CONDO ASSN INC 8/25/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED LILIANA DE LA TOREET 10/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT NO 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSN INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - RITA DE LA TORRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - LILIANA DE LA TORRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - HIDDEN VILLAGE CONDO ASSN INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022095925

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIDDEN VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant