This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Seminole County on 11/20/2021 at 09:30:36 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATIO -VS- MICHEAL M JAVAHERI

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATIO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MICHEAL M JAVAHERI. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Seminole County, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1604

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019 GS7

Defendants

MICHEAL M JAVAHERI

GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

MEHDI JAVAHERI

THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 2005

SILVER LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

BANK OF AMERICA NA

CAPITAL ONE BANK

CENTRAL FLORIDA EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA

DISCOVER BANK

KATARZYNA JAVAHERI

LARRY CHESTNUT

JUDY CHESTNUT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KARISSA CHIN DUNCAN

SCOTT GRIFFITH

Defendant Attorneys

BEN ZAERI

SARAH WEBNER

MATTHEW CICCIO

 

Court Documents

SUGGESTION OF DEATH OF DEFT GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI - BY DEFT MICHAEL JAVAHERI

10/25/2021: SUGGESTION OF DEATH OF DEFT GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI - BY DEFT MICHAEL JAVAHERI

MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT MICHAEL JAVAHERI

10/25/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT MICHAEL JAVAHERI

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY SCOTT GRIFFITH ESQ OBO PLTF

10/27/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY SCOTT GRIFFITH ESQ OBO PLTF

RESPONSE TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL BY PLTF

10/29/2021: RESPONSE TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL BY PLTF

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFTS UNK BENEFICIARIES OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 2005

10/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFTS UNK BENEFICIARIES OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 2005

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDICIAL BY PLTF

10/12/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDICIAL BY PLTF

RETURNED MAIL TO CENTRAL FL EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION - UTF

10/13/2021: RETURNED MAIL TO CENTRAL FL EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION - UTF

RETURNED MAIL TO CENTRAL FLORIDA EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION - UTF

10/01/2021: RETURNED MAIL TO CENTRAL FLORIDA EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION - UTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER TO PARTIES BY PLTF

09/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER TO PARTIES BY PLTF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE SHEET

06/25/2021: VALUE SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL M JAVAHERI AKA MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL M JAVAHERI AKA MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

SUMMONS ISSUED - GLOHAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI AS CO TRESTEE OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN HAVEHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DTD NOV 2005

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - GLOHAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI AS CO TRESTEE OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN HAVEHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DTD NOV 2005

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE OF GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE OF GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI

SUMMONS ISSUED - MEHDI JAVAHERI AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOV 2005

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - MEHDI JAVAHERI AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOV 2005

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MEHDI JAVAHERI

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MEHDI JAVAHERI

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK BENEFICIARIES OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVEHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOV 2005

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK BENEFICIARIES OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVEHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOV 2005

SUMMONS ISSUED - THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSN INC

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSN INC

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY SCOTT GRIFFITH ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT MICHAEL JAVAHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF DEATH OF DEFT GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI - BY DEFT MICHAEL JAVAHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL TO CENTRAL FL EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION - UTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDICIAL BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFTS UNK BENEFICIARIES OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL TO CENTRAL FLORIDA EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION - UTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER TO PARTIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SILVER LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK BENEFICIARIES OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVEHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOV 2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MEHDI JAVAHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MEHDI JAVAHERI AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED NOV 2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE OF GHOLAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - GLOHAM HOSSEIN JAVAHERI AS CO TRESTEE OF THE GHOLAM HOSSEIN HAVEHERI TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DTD NOV 2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL M JAVAHERI AKA MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CROSSINGS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SILVER LAKE HOA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-GS3 is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL FLORDIA EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant