Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/19/2020 at 19:50:07 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIL ASSN -VS- TERRENCE MCGOVERN

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 US BANK TRUST NATIL ASSN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TERRENCE MCGOVERN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0233

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US BANK TRUST NATIL ASSN

4755 Technology Way, Suite 104

Boca Raton, FL 33431

LODGE SERIES III TRUST

Defendants

TERRENCE MCGOVERN

Lake Mary, FL 32746

TIMACUAN COMMUNITY SVC ASSN INC

C/O Premier Association Management Of Cfl, 3112 West Lake Mary Blvd.

Lake Mary, FL 32746

BANK OF AMERICA NA

C/O Ct Corporation System, R.A., 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

KIMBERLY MCGOVERN

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS HOWARD

Defendant Attorneys

JUSTIN CLARK

ANDREW ARIAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SPOUSE OF TERRANCE MCGOVERN UNK SPOUSE OF KIMBERLY MCGOVERN UNK TENANT #1 & UNK TENANT #2 BY PLTF

04/16/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SPOUSE OF TERRANCE MCGOVERN UNK SPOUSE OF KIMBERLY MCGOVERN UNK TENANT #1 & UNK TENANT #2 BY PLTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY ANDREW ARIAS ESQ OBO DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

04/08/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY ANDREW ARIAS ESQ OBO DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

04/08/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

ANSWER NON CONTESTING & CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS BY DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

04/09/2020: ANSWER NON CONTESTING & CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS BY DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

03/16/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

RESPONSE & AVOIDANCE TO ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

03/23/2020: RESPONSE & AVOIDANCE TO ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE /GRANTED - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/25/20

02/25/2020: ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE /GRANTED - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/25/20

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAL ADDRESS BY JUSTIN R CLARK OBO DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

02/20/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAL ADDRESS BY JUSTIN R CLARK OBO DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

02/20/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/29/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020011382

01/29/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020011382

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/29/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE SHEET

01/29/2020: VALUE SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/29/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - TERRENCE MCGOVERN

01/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - TERRENCE MCGOVERN

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE TERRENCE MCGOVERN

01/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE TERRENCE MCGOVERN

SUMMONS ISSUED - KIMBERLY MCGOVERN

01/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - KIMBERLY MCGOVERN

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE KIMBERLY MCGOVERN

01/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE KIMBERLY MCGOVERN

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SPOUSE OF TERRANCE MCGOVERN UNK SPOUSE OF KIMBERLY MCGOVERN UNK TENANT #1 & UNK TENANT #2 BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER NON CONTESTING & CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS BY DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY ANDREW ARIAS ESQ OBO DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE & AVOIDANCE TO ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE /GRANTED - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAL ADDRESS BY JUSTIN R CLARK OBO DEFT TERRENCE MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - TIMACUAN COMMUNITY SVC ASSN INC 2/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - TIMACUAN COMMUNITY SVC ASSN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE KIMBERLY MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KIMBERLY MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE TERRENCE MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - TERRENCE MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020011382

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUSTIN CLARK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARIAS, ANDREW