Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/23/2020 at 14:16:42 (UTC).

US BANK NATL ASSN -VS- LINDA MOORE BUCK

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 US BANK NATL ASSN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against LINDA MOORE BUCK. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0149

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US BANK NATL ASSN

1239 E Newport Center Drive, Suite 110

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

RESIDENTIAL ASSET MTG PRODUCTS INC MTG ASSET BACKED PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 SP4

Defendants

LINDA MOORE BUCK

Deltona, FL 32725

LINDA M MOORE

ESTATES AT WEKIVA PARK HOA INC

6972 Lake Gloria Blvd

Orlando, FL 32809

JAMES E BUCK

Apopka, FL 32712

SPRUCE CREEK GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB HOA INC

6972 Lake Gloria Blvd.

Orlando, FL 32809

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLI ADAMS

Defendant Attorneys

ERIK DELETOILE

JOHN DIMASI

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT BY DEFT LINDA MOORE

05/29/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT BY DEFT LINDA MOORE

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT LINDA MOORE MOTION TO DISMISS BY PLTF

06/03/2020: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT LINDA MOORE MOTION TO DISMISS BY PLTF

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SPOUSE OF LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE UNK SPOUSE OF JAMES BUCK UNK HEIRS OF LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE & UNK HEIRS OF JAMES

06/25/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SPOUSE OF LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE UNK SPOUSE OF JAMES BUCK UNK HEIRS OF LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE & UNK HEIRS OF JAMES

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE /MAILING OF ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION TO AMEND CMPL BY INTERLINEATION TO PARTIES BY PLTF

07/01/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE /MAILING OF ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION TO AMEND CMPL BY INTERLINEATION TO PARTIES BY PLTF

ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY INTERLINEATION - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/19/20

03/19/2020: ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY INTERLINEATION - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/19/20

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

03/16/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

03/16/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

03/16/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

03/16/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/22/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020008314

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020008314

CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

01/22/2020: CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

VALUE SHEET

01/22/2020: VALUE SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - JAMES E BUCK

01/22/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - JAMES E BUCK

SUMMONS ISSUED - LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE

01/22/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE

SUMMONS ISSUED - SPRUCE CREEK GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB HOA INC

01/22/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - SPRUCE CREEK GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB HOA INC

SUMMONS ISSUED - ESTATES AT WEKIVA PARK HOA INC

01/22/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - ESTATES AT WEKIVA PARK HOA INC

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE /MAILING OF ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION TO AMEND CMPL BY INTERLINEATION TO PARTIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SPOUSE OF LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE UNK SPOUSE OF JAMES BUCK UNK HEIRS OF LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE & UNK HEIRS OF JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT LINDA MOORE MOTION TO DISMISS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT BY DEFT LINDA MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY INTERLINEATION - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICES TO JAMES E BUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ESTATES AT WEKIVA PARK HOA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SPRUCE CREEK GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB HOA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - LINDA MOORE BUCK NKA LINDA M MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - JAMES E BUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020008314

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Bank Nat Assn is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adams, Holli E