Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 18:40:54 (UTC).

UDR INC -VS- TARELL BENDER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 UDR INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TARELL BENDER. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0744

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UDR INC

REGATTA SHORES APARTMENTS

Defendant

TARELL BENDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN WOLK

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/18/21 Instrument: 2021035555

03/18/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/18/21 Instrument: 2021035555

WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 3/23/21

03/22/2021: WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 3/23/21

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D TARELL BENDER

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D TARELL BENDER

COMPLAINT FILED

02/26/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED UNSERVED -POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 3/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/18/21 Instrument: 2021035555

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST TARELL BENDER 3/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE /LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D TARELL BENDER PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D TARELL BENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGATTA SHORES APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where UDR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLK, BRIAN