Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 17:16:57 (UTC).

UDR INC -VS- SYLVIA N BIRD

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 UDR INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SYLVIA N BIRD. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0764

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UDR INC

ALAFAYA WOODS APARTMENTS

Defendants

SYLVIA N BIRD

SYLVIA C BIRD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID WEISSE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/03/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT FILED

03/01/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D SYLVIA N BIRD & SYLVIA C BIRD

03/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D SYLVIA N BIRD & SYLVIA C BIRD

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketLETTER / EMAIL RE: EMERGENCY RENTAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO SYLVIA N BIRD & SYLVIA C BIRD - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/18/21 Instrument: 2021035546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST SYLVIA N BIRD & SYLVIA C BIRD 3/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE /LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D SYLVIA N BIRD & SYLVIA C BIRD 3/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D SYLVIA N BIRD & SYLVIA C BIRD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAFAYA WOODS APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where UDR INC is a litigant