Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/28/2021 at 16:39:31 (UTC).

UDR INC -VS- RUT VARGAS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 UDR INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RUT VARGAS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0049

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UDR INC

REGATTA SHORES APARTMENTS

Defendant

RUT VARGAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN WOLK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

01/06/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL APPROVING STIP - JUDGE DEKLEVA 1/26/21 Instrument: 2021012142

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D RUT VARGAS 1/9/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE /LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D RUT VARGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGATTA SHORES APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where UDR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLK, BRIAN