Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/22/2021 at 17:54:40 (UTC).

UDR INC -VS- JOHN DE OLIVEIRA

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 UDR INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JOHN DE OLIVEIRA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0053

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UDR INC

REGATTA SHORES APARTMENTS

Defendant

JOHN DE OLIVEIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN WOLK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

01/07/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JOHN DE OLIVEIRA

01/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JOHN DE OLIVEIRA

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED SERVED (POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTING - WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED - 1/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO JOHN DE OLIVEIRA - JUDGE DEKLEVA 1/26/21 Instrument: 2021012143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST JOHN DE OLIVEIRA - 1/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE /LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D JOHN DE OLIVEIRA 1/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D JOHN DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGATTA SHORES APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where UDR INC is a litigant