Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 15:46:39 (UTC).

UDR INC -VS- JAHHAILE COAKLEY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 UDR INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JAHHAILE COAKLEY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0743

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UDR INC

LOS ALTOS APARTMENTS

Defendant

JAHHAILE COAKLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN WOLK

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAHHAILE COAKLEY

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAHHAILE COAKLEY

COMPLAINT FILED

02/26/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JAHHAILE COAKLEY 3/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE /LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JAHHAILE COAKLEY PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAHHAILE COAKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ALTOS APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where UDR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLK, BRIAN