Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/05/2021 at 17:40:12 (UTC).

UDR INC -VS- CEDRIC VANTERPOOL

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 UDR INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CEDRIC VANTERPOOL. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1101

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UDR INC

LOTUS LANDING APARTMENTS

Defendant

CEDRIC VANTERPOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN WOLK

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - CEDRIC VANTERPOOL

03/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - CEDRIC VANTERPOOL

COMPLAINT FILED

03/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 4/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/22/21 Instrument: 2021053696

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST CEDRIC VANTERPOOL 4/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT / LANDLORD CARES ACT INFO SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - CEDRIC VANTERPOOL ON 3/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CEDRIC VANTERPOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOTUS LANDING APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where UDR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLK, BRIAN