Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 17:16:27 (UTC).

UDR INC -VS- BRADLEY CARAVIELLO

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 UDR INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRADLEY CARAVIELLO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0886

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UDR INC

SEVILLE ON THE GREEN APARTMENTS

Defendants

BRADLEY CARAVIELLO

CYNTHIA CARAVIELLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID WEISSE

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & JUDGMENT BY PLTF

03/23/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & JUDGMENT BY PLTF

NOTICE /LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET BY PLTF

03/16/2021: NOTICE /LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET BY PLTF

ANSWER BY DEFT BRADLEY CARAVIELLO

03/19/2021: ANSWER BY DEFT BRADLEY CARAVIELLO

AFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT BRADLEY CARAVIELLO

03/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT BRADLEY CARAVIELLO

COMPLAINT FILED

03/09/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D BRADLEY CARAVIELLO & CYNTHIA CARAVIELLO

03/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D BRADLEY CARAVIELLO & CYNTHIA CARAVIELLO

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & JUDGMENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT BRADLEY CARAVIELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT BRADLEY CARAVIELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE /LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D BRADLEY CARAVIELLO & CYNTHIA CARAVIELLO PSTD 3/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D BRADLEY CARAVIELLO & CYNTHIA CARAVIELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEVILLE ON THE GREEN APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where UDR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID WEISSE