This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 09/26/2022 at 20:15:02 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK -VS- LOUIS FEDULLO

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 TRUIST BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOUIS FEDULLO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2756

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUIST BANK

SUNTRUST BANK

LIGHTSTREAM

Defendant

LOUIS FEDULLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMY WINARSKY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED LOUIS FEDULLO

2022-07-26 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED LOUIS FEDULLO

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT FILED W/COPY OF CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

07/26/2022: COMPLAINT FILED W/COPY OF CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 7/27/22

07/27/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 7/27/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED LOUIS FEDULLO 7/30/22

08/02/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED LOUIS FEDULLO 7/30/22

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

09/02/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST LOUIS FEDULLO - 9/8/22

09/02/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST LOUIS FEDULLO - 9/8/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST LOUIS FEDULLO - 9/8/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED LOUIS FEDULLO 7/30/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 7/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED LOUIS FEDULLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED W/COPY OF CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIGHTSTREAM is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winarsky, Amy Jill